IA SSB1005 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF158
Note: Legislation replaced by HF336
Note: Legislation replaced by HF336
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-23 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-23 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to postconviction relief procedure and the underlying trial court record of the proceedings challenged.
Title
A bill for an act relating to postconviction relief procedure and the underlying trial court record of the proceedings challenged.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-23 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Subcommittee: Dawson, Sweeney and R. Taylor. |
2019-01-15 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
HSB28 (Related) 2019-02-06 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 232.
SF158 (Replaced by) 2019-05-01 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1194.
HF336 (Replaced by) 2019-04-18 - Withdrawn. H.J. 922.
SF158 (Replaced by) 2019-05-01 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1194.
HF336 (Replaced by) 2019-04-18 - Withdrawn. H.J. 922.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SSB1005 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SSB1005.html |