IA SSB1014 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Note: Legislation replaced by SF152
Note: Legislation replaced by HF328

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: N/A - 0% progression
Action: 2019-01-24 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to the definition of vulnerable elder.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to the definition of vulnerable elder.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-24SenateSubcommittee recommends passage.
2019-01-15SenateSubcommittee: Dawson, Kinney and Shipley.
2019-01-15SenateBy COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY

Same As/Similar To

HSB30 (Related) 2019-02-06 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 232.
SF152 (Replaced by) 2019-04-25 - Withdrawn. S.J. 1118.
HF328 (Replaced by) 2019-05-10 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1080.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback