IA SSB1040 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Note: Legislation replaced by HF388

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: N/A - 0% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Subcommittee Meeting: 04/03/2019 11:30AM Senate Lobbyist Lounge.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to special certificates issued to aircraft manufacturers, transporters, and dealers, providing fees, making penalties applicable, and including effective date and applicability provisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to special certificates issued to aircraft manufacturers, transporters, and dealers, providing fees, making penalties applicable, and including effective date and applicability provisions.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28SenateSubcommittee Meeting: 04/03/2019 11:30AM Senate Lobbyist Lounge.
2019-01-23SenateSubcommittee: Feenstra, Dawson and Quirmbach.
2019-01-23SenateBy COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS

Same As/Similar To

HSB88 (Related) 2019-02-13 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 292.
HF388 (Replaced by) 2019-02-28 - Subcommittee recommends passage.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback