IA SSB1146 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF532
Note: Legislation replaced by HF678
Note: Legislation replaced by HF678
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-04 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-04 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to notice and opportunity to repair construction defects in new construction, and including effective date and applicability provisions.
Title
A bill for an act relating to notice and opportunity to repair construction defects in new construction, and including effective date and applicability provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-04 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Subcommittee: Garrett, Hogg and Whiting. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
HSB177 (Related) 2019-03-06 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 419.
SF532 (Replaced by) 2019-04-15 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 949.
HF678 (Replaced by) 2019-04-03 - Withdrawn. H.J. 736.
SF532 (Replaced by) 2019-04-15 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 949.
HF678 (Replaced by) 2019-04-03 - Withdrawn. H.J. 736.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SSB1146 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SSB1146.html |