IA SSB1257 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Note: Legislation replaced by SF632
Note: Legislation replaced by HF782

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: N/A - 0% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act making appropriations to the department of public health for the gambling treatment program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act making appropriations to the department of public health for the gambling treatment program.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-17SenateSubcommittee recommends passage.
2019-04-16SenateSubcommittee: Breitbach, Kraayenbrink, and Bolkcom.
2019-04-16SenateBy COMMITTEE ON APPROPRIATIONS

Same As/Similar To

HSB258 (Related) 2019-04-23 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 983.
SF632 (Replaced by) 2019-05-13 - Signed by Governor.
HF782 (Replaced by) 2019-04-25 - Withdrawn. H.J. 1042.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback