IA SSB3056 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2135
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-31 - Reported out of committee as SF 2135.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-31 - Reported out of committee as SF 2135.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to a disinterment permit for human and cremated remains.
Title
A bill for an act relating to a disinterment permit for human and cremated remains.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-31 | Senate | Reported out of committee as SF 2135. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/28/2020 11:30AM Senate Lobbyist Lounge. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Subcommittee: Whiting, Celsi, and Johnson. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Introduced, referred to State Government. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON STATE GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
SF2135 (Replaced by) 2020-06-01 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 658.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SSB3056 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SSB3056.html |