ID H0008 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 7, 2019 Session Law Chapter 42 Effective: 07/01/2019; 07/01/2024 Sunset Clause
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 7, 2019 Session Law Chapter 42 Effective: 07/01/2019; 07/01/2024 Sunset Clause
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
MIDWIFERY -- Amends existing law to remove obsolete language, to update the list of formulary drugs that midwives are authorized to use, and to clarify the requirements regarding practice data required for license renewal.
Title
Amends existing law to remove obsolete language, to update the list of formulary drugs that midwives are authorized to use, and to clarify the requirements regarding practice data required for license renewal.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 7, 2019 Session Law Chapter 42 Effective: 07/01/2019; 07/01/2024 Sunset Clause |
2019-03-07 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:50 a.m. on March 6, 2019 |
2019-03-06 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2019-03-04 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2019-03-01 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2019-02-28 | Senate | to House |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Title apvd |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 35-0-0 |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Health & Welfare |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2019-01-28 | House | to Senate |
2019-01-28 | House | Title apvd |
2019-01-28 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 70-0-0 |
2019-01-25 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2019-01-24 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2019-01-15 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Health & Welfare |
2019-01-14 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |