ID H0014 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-08 - Reported Signed by Governor on February 8, 2019 Session Law Chapter 9 Effective: Retroactive to 01/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-08 - Reported Signed by Governor on February 8, 2019 Session Law Chapter 9 Effective: Retroactive to 01/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
INCOME TAXES -- Amends existing law to revise the method of computing a taxpayer's net operating loss.
Title
Amends existing law to revise the method of computing a taxpayer's net operating loss.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-08 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on February 8, 2019 Session Law Chapter 9 Effective: Retroactive to 01/01/2019 |
2019-02-11 | House | Delivered to Governor at 11:12 a.m. on February 8, 2019 |
2019-02-08 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2019-02-06 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2019-02-05 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2019-02-04 | Senate | to House |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Title apvd |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 35-0-0 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Local Government & Taxation |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2019-01-21 | House | to Senate |
2019-01-21 | House | Title apvd |
2019-01-21 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 65-3-2 |
2019-01-18 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2019-01-17 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2019-01-15 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Revenue & Taxation |
2019-01-14 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |