ID H0093 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 29, 2019 Session Law Chapter 259 Effective: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 29, 2019 Session Law Chapter 259 Effective: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
EDUCATION -- Amends existing law to provide that approved nontraditional educator preparation programs may receive funding under certain circumstances.
Title
Amends existing law to provide that approved nontraditional educator preparation programs may receive funding under certain circumstances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 29, 2019 Session Law Chapter 259 Effective: 07/01/2019 |
2019-03-29 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:30 a.m. on March 28, 2019 |
2019-03-28 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2019-03-26 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2019-03-25 | House | to enrol |
2019-03-25 | House | Title apvd |
2019-03-25 | House | Read third time in full as amended in Senate -- PASSED 39-27-4 |
2019-03-22 | House | Read second time as amended in Senate; Filed for Third Reading |
2019-03-21 | House | Read first time as amended in Senate; Filed for Second Reading |
2019-03-21 | House | Reported Engrossed; Filed for First Reading of Engrossed Bills |
2019-03-20 | House | Bills as Amended Referred to JRA for Engrossing |
2019-03-20 | House | House Concurred in Senate Amendments |
2019-03-20 | House | Reported out of Committee and Recommend Concurrence |
2019-03-19 | House | Referred to Education for concurrence recommendation |
2019-03-19 | House | Returned from the Senate Amended |
2019-03-18 | Senate | to House |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Title apvd |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Read third time as amended in the Senate -- PASSED 33-0-2 |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Read second time as amended in the Senate, filed for Third Reading |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Read first time as amended in the Senate; Filed for Second Reading |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Amendments reported printed |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Reported out as amended; filed for first reading |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Amendments ordered printed |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Placed in the Committee of the Whole |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Reported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Education |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2019-02-28 | House | to Senate |
2019-02-28 | House | Title apvd |
2019-02-28 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 43-25-2 |
2019-02-27 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2019-02-26 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2019-02-25 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2019-02-22 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2019-02-06 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Education |
2019-02-05 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |