ID H0107 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-22 - Returned from Senate Failed; Filed in the office of the Chief Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-22 - Returned from Senate Failed; Filed in the office of the Chief Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
SALES TAX -- Amends existing law to revise the percentage and allocation of sales tax funds to transportation programs, and establishes a Bridge Maintenance and Replacement Program with a percentage of such funds.
Title
Amends existing law to revise the percentage and allocation of sales tax funds to transportation programs, and establishes a Bridge Maintenance and Replacement Program with a percentage of such funds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-22 | House | Returned from Senate Failed; Filed in the office of the Chief Clerk |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Ret’d to House |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Read third time as amended in the Senate -- FAILED 16-19-0 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Retained on calendar |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Retained on calendar |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Read second time as amended in the Senate, filed for Third Reading |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Read first time as amended in the Senate; Filed for Second Reading |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Amendments reported printed |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Reported out as amended; filed for first reading |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Amendments ordered printed |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Placed in the Committee of the Whole |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Reported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Transportation |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2019-02-20 | House | to Senate |
2019-02-20 | House | Title apvd |
2019-02-20 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 52-18-0 |
2019-02-19 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2019-02-18 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2019-02-08 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Transportation & Defense |
2019-02-07 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |