ID H0122 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-04 - Without recommendation on concurrence, Held at desk
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-04 - Without recommendation on concurrence, Held at desk
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
HEMP -- Amends and adds to existing law to provide legislative intent; to provide for research, production, and regulation of hemp; and to provide an exception regarding tetrahydrocannabinols.
Title
Amends and adds to existing law to provide legislative intent; to provide for research, production, and regulation of hemp; and to provide an exception regarding tetrahydrocannabinols.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-04 | House | Without recommendation on concurrence, Held at desk |
2019-04-01 | House | Referred to Agricultural Affairs for concurrence recommendation |
2019-04-01 | House | Returned from the Senate Amended |
2019-04-01 | Senate | to House |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Title apvd |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Read third time as amended in the Senate -- PASSED 32-3-0 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Read second time as amended in the Senate, filed for Third Reading |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Read first time as amended in the Senate; Filed for Second Reading |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Amendments reported printed |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Reported out as amended; filed for first reading |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Amendments ordered printed |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Placed in the Committee of the Whole |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Reported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2019-03-18 | House | to Senate |
2019-03-18 | House | Title apvd |
2019-03-18 | House | Rules Suspended: |
2019-03-18 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2019-03-15 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2019-02-12 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Agricultural Affairs |
2019-02-11 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |