ID H0169 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-05 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 5, 2019 Session Law Chapter 315 Effective: 07/01/2019; 07/01/2021 Sunset Clause
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-05 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 5, 2019 Session Law Chapter 315 Effective: 07/01/2019; 07/01/2021 Sunset Clause
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
FEDERALISM -- Adds to existing law to provide for the Committee on Federalism.
Title
Adds to existing law to provide for the Committee on Federalism.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-05 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on April 5, 2019 Session Law Chapter 315 Effective: 07/01/2019; 07/01/2021 Sunset Clause |
2019-04-05 | House | Delivered to Governor at 1:50 p.m. on April 4, 2019 |
2019-04-04 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2019-04-03 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2019-04-02 | House | to enrol |
2019-04-02 | House | Title apvd |
2019-04-02 | House | Read third time in full as amended in Senate -- PASSED 54-14-2 |
2019-04-01 | House | Read second time as amended in Senate; Filed for Third Reading |
2019-03-29 | House | Read first time as amended in Senate; Filed for Second Reading |
2019-03-29 | House | Reported Engrossed; Filed for First Reading of Engrossed Bills |
2019-03-28 | House | Bills as Amended Referred to JRA for Engrossing |
2019-03-28 | House | House Concurred in Senate Amendments |
2019-03-28 | House | Reported out of Committee and Recommend Concurrence |
2019-03-27 | House | Referred to State Affairs for concurrence recommendation |
2019-03-27 | House | Returned from the Senate Amended |
2019-03-26 | Senate | to House |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Title apvd |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Read third time as amended in the Senate -- PASSED 26-9-0 |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Read second time as amended in the Senate, filed for Third Reading |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Read first time as amended in the Senate; Filed for Second Reading |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Amendments reported printed |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Reported out as amended; filed for first reading |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Amendments ordered printed |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Placed in the Committee of the Whole |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Reported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2019-03-01 | House | to Senate |
2019-03-01 | House | Title apvd |
2019-03-01 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 47-20-3 |
2019-02-28 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2019-02-27 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2019-02-26 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2019-02-18 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to State Affairs |
2019-02-15 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |