ID H0294 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-09 - U.C. to be returned to Revenue & Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-09 - U.C. to be returned to Revenue & Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
TAXING DISTRICTS -- Amends existing law to revise the distribution of driver's license fees, to revise the sales tax distribution formula, and to revise provisions regarding the use of sales tax revenues by special purpose taxing districts.
Title
Amends existing law to revise the distribution of driver's license fees, to revise the sales tax distribution formula, and to revise provisions regarding the use of sales tax revenues by special purpose taxing districts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-09 | House | U.C. to be returned to Revenue & Taxation Committee |
2019-04-08 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2019-04-05 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, April 8, 2019 |
2019-04-04 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2019-04-03 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2019-04-02 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2019-04-01 | House | U.C. to place at bottom of third reading calendar one legislative day |
2019-03-29 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2019-03-28 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2019-03-27 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Revenue & Taxation |
2019-03-27 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |
Subjects
Idaho State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.idaho.gov/sessioninfo/2019/legislation/H0294/ |
Text | https://legislature.idaho.gov/wp-content/uploads/sessioninfo/2019/legislation/H0294.pdf |