ID H0340 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-20 - Returned from Governor vetoed on March 30, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-20 - Returned from Governor vetoed on March 30, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
CHILD CARE LICENSING -- Amends existing law to define “temporary alcohol-drug abuse treatment facility.”
Title
Amends existing law to define “temporary alcohol-drug abuse treatment facility.”
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-20 | House | Returned from Governor vetoed on March 30, 2020 |
2020-03-19 | House | Delivered to Governor at 8:19 p.m. on March 18, 2020 |
2020-03-18 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2020-03-18 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2020-03-18 | House | to enrol |
2020-03-18 | House | Title apvd |
2020-03-18 | House | Rules Suspended: |
2020-03-18 | House | Read second time as amended in Senate; Filed for Third Reading |
2020-03-17 | House | Read first time as amended in Senate; Filed for Second Reading |
2020-03-17 | House | Reported Engrossed; Filed for First Reading of Engrossed Bills |
2020-03-17 | House | Bills as Amended Referred to JRA for Engrossing |
2020-03-17 | House | House Concurred in Senate Amendments |
2020-03-17 | House | Returned from the Senate Amended; Held at Desk |
2020-03-16 | Senate | to House |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Title apvd |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Read third time as amended in the Senate -- PASSED 26-9-0 |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Retained on calendar |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Read second time as amended in the Senate, filed for Third Reading |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Read first time as amended in the Senate; Filed for Second Reading |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Amendments reported printed |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Reported out as amended; filed for first reading |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Amendments ordered printed |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Placed in the Committee of the Whole |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Reported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Health & Welfare |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2020-03-02 | House | to Senate |
2020-03-02 | House | Title apvd |
2020-03-02 | House | Read third time in full as amended -- PASSED 44-24-1 |
2020-02-28 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, March 2, 2020 |
2020-02-27 | House | Read second time as amended; Filed for Third Reading |
2020-02-26 | House | Read first time as amended; filed for Second Reading |
2020-02-26 | House | Reported Engrossed; Filed for First Reading of Engrossed Bills |
2020-02-25 | House | Bill as Amended Referred to JRA for Engrossing |
2020-02-25 | House | Amendments Referred to the JRA for Printing |
2020-02-25 | House | Reported out without recommendation as amended |
2020-02-25 | House | Referred to the Committee of the Whole |
2020-01-29 | House | Reported out of Committee, Recommend place on General Orders |
2020-01-21 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Health & Welfare |
2020-01-20 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |