ID H0355 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-09 - Reported Signed by Governor on February 9, 2018 Session Law Chapter 3 Effective: Retroactive to 01/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-09 - Reported Signed by Governor on February 9, 2018 Session Law Chapter 3 Effective: Retroactive to 01/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
INCOME TAXATION -- Amends existing law to clarify what the term “Internal Revenue Code” means for state income tax purposes and to provide adjustments to taxable income for corporations.
Title
Amends existing law to clarify what the term “Internal Revenue Code” means for state income tax purposes and to provide adjustments to taxable income for corporations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-09 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on February 9, 2018 Session Law Chapter 3 Effective: Retroactive to 01/01/2018 |
2018-02-12 | House | Delivered to Governor at 11:15 a.m. on February 9, 2018 |
2018-02-09 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2018-02-07 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2018-02-06 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2018-02-05 | Senate | to House |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Title apvd |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 33-0-2 |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Local Government & Taxation |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2018-01-24 | House | to Senate |
2018-01-24 | House | Title apvd |
2018-01-24 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 64-5-1 |
2018-01-23 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2018-01-22 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2018-01-17 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Revenue & Taxation |
2018-01-16 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |