ID H0449 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: Local Government & Taxation
Pending: Senate Local Government and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: Local Government & Taxation
Pending: Senate Local Government and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
INCOME TAXATION -- Amends existing law to provide that capital gains and losses on precious metal bullion and monetized bullion sales be added to or subtracted from Idaho taxable income under certain circumstances.
Title
Amends existing law to provide that capital gains and losses on precious metal bullion and monetized bullion sales be added to or subtracted from Idaho taxable income under certain circumstances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Local Government & Taxation |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2018-02-12 | House | to Senate |
2018-02-12 | House | Title apvd |
2018-02-12 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 60-9-1 |
2018-02-09 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, February 12, 2018 |
2018-02-07 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2018-02-06 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2018-01-31 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Revenue & Taxation |
2018-01-30 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |