ID S1004 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Session Law Chapter 142 Effective: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Session Law Chapter 142 Effective: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
IDAHO STATE POLICE -- Adds to and amends existing law to establish the Blue Alert system in Idaho when a suspect for a crime involving the death or serious injury of a peace officer has not been apprehended and law enforcement personnel have determined that the suspect may be a serious threat to the public, or when a peace officer becomes missing while in the line of duty under circumstances warranting concern for such peace officer's safety.
Title
Adds to and amends existing law to establish the Blue Alert system in Idaho when a suspect for a crime involving the death or serious injury of a peace officer has not been apprehended and law enforcement personnel have determined that the suspect may be a serious threat to the public, or when a peace officer becomes missing while in the line of duty under circumstances warranting concern for such peace officer's safety.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | Senate | Session Law Chapter 142 Effective: 07/01/2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2019-03-19 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2019-03-14 | House | to Senate |
2019-03-14 | House | Title apvd |
2019-03-14 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 58-0-12 |
2019-03-13 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2019-03-12 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2019-03-11 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2019-03-08 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2019-01-30 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration |
2019-01-30 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2019-01-29 | Senate | to House |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Title apvd |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 35-0-0 |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Retained on calendar |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Judiciary & Rules |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |