ID S1005 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Session Law Chapter 143 Effective: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Session Law Chapter 143 Effective: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
HUMAN TRAFFICKING -- Amends and repeals existing law to revise legislative intent, to revise the definition of “human trafficking,” to define terms, and to revise the penalty for human trafficking.
Title
Amends and repeals existing law to revise legislative intent, to revise the definition of “human trafficking,” to define terms, and to revise the penalty for human trafficking.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | Senate | Session Law Chapter 143 Effective: 07/01/2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2019-03-19 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2019-03-15 | House | to Senate |
2019-03-15 | House | Title apvd |
2019-03-15 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 67-0-3 |
2019-03-14 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2019-03-14 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2019-03-13 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2019-03-12 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2019-03-11 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2019-03-08 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2019-02-22 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration |
2019-02-22 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2019-02-21 | Senate | to House |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Title apvd |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Read third time in full as amended -- PASSED 34-0-1 |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Read second time as amended, filed for Third reading |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Read first time as amended, filed for Second Reading |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Reported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Amendments reported printed |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Amendments ordered printed; referred for engrossment |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Reported out without recommendation, as amended |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Placed in the Committee of the Whole |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Referred to 14th Order for amendment |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Retained on calendar |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Judiciary & Rules |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |