ID S1078 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - Session Law Chapter 214 Effective: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - Session Law Chapter 214 Effective: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
BEER -- Amends and adds to existing law to authorize contract brewing in certain instances and to provide certain requirements for a contractee brewer and a contractor brewer.
Title
Amends and adds to existing law to authorize contract brewing in certain instances and to provide certain requirements for a contractee brewer and a contractor brewer.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-25 | Senate | Session Law Chapter 214 Effective: 07/01/2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2019-03-19 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2019-03-14 | House | to Senate |
2019-03-14 | House | Title apvd |
2019-03-14 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 59-2-9 |
2019-03-13 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2019-03-12 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2019-03-11 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2019-03-08 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, March 11, 2019 |
2019-03-07 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2019-03-06 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2019-03-04 | House | Read First Time, Referred to State Affairs |
2019-03-04 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2019-03-01 | Senate | to House |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Title apvd |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 28-4-3 |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to State Affairs |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |