ID S1159 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-05 - Recommitted to State Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-05 - Recommitted to State Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
INITIATIVES -- Amends and adds to existing law to revise ballot initiative requirements.
Title
Amends and adds to existing law to revise ballot initiative requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-05 | Senate | Recommitted to State Affairs |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2019-04-02 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2019-03-29 | House | to Senate |
2019-03-29 | House | Title apvd |
2019-03-29 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 40-30-0 |
2019-03-28 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2019-03-27 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2019-03-26 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2019-03-22 | House | Read First Time, Referred to State Affairs |
2019-03-22 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2019-03-22 | Senate | to House |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Title apvd |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Read third time in full as amended -- PASSED 18-17-0 |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Read in full as required) |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Rules Suspended (2/3 Vote |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Read second time as amended, filed for Third reading |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Read first time as amended, filed for Second Reading |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Reported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Amendments reported printed |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Amendments ordered printed; referred for engrossment |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Reported out without recommendation, as amended |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Placed in the Committee of the Whole |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Reported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to State Affairs |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |