ID S1302 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-20 - Session Law Chapter 167 Effective: 07/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-20 - Session Law Chapter 167 Effective: 07/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
INSURANCE -- Adds to existing law to define a term, to prohibit discrimination against living organ donors, and to provide for enforcement.
Title
Adds to existing law to define a term, to prohibit discrimination against living organ donors, and to provide for enforcement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-20 | Senate | Session Law Chapter 167 Effective: 07/01/2018 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2018-03-14 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2018-03-12 | House | to Senate |
2018-03-12 | House | Title apvd |
2018-03-12 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 51-12-7 |
2018-03-09 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2018-03-08 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2018-02-28 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Business |
2018-02-28 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2018-02-27 | Senate | to House |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Title apvd |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 24-11-0 -Webb |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Retained on calendar |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Retained on calendar |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Commerce & Human Resources |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |