IL HB0004 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that doula services shall be covered under the medical assistance program. Sets forth certain certification and training requirements a doula must satisfy to qualify for reimbursement under the medical assistance program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MEDICAID-DOULA SERVICES

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-15HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019
2019-05-15HouseTo Medicaid & Managed Care Subcommittee
2019-05-15HouseAssigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
2019-03-29HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith
2019-03-22HouseTo Medicaid & Managed Care Subcommittee
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2019-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2019-02-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2019-01-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2019-01-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2019-01-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez
2019-01-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
2019-01-29HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva
2019-01-29HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2019-01-29HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2019-01-29HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2019-01-29HouseAssigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
2019-01-29HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2019-01-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-01-09HouseFirst Reading
2018-11-30HousePrefiled with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
30555-5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback