IL HB0014 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-08-22 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Sexual Assault Evidence Submission Act. Provides that the Department of State Police shall create and operate a statewide sexual assault evidence kit tracking system. Provides that on and after the effective date of the amendatory Act, each sexual assault evidence kit created shall have a tracking mechanism attached to the kit for input into the statewide sexual assault evidence kit tracking system. Provides that every sexual assault evidence kit shall have the tracking mechanism attached to the kit for input into the statewide sexual assault evidence kit tracking system on or before January 1, 2020. Provides that the statewide sexual assault evidence kit tracking system shall: (1) track the location and status of sexual assault evidence kits throughout the criminal justice process, including the initial collection in examinations performed at medical facilities, receipt at local law enforcement agencies, and receipt and analysis at forensic laboratories; (2) allow medical facilities performing sexual assault forensic examinations, law enforcement agencies, prosecutors, State and local crime laboratories, and other entities who have physical custody of sexual assault evidence kits to update and track the status and location of sexual assault evidence kits; (3) allow victims of sexual assault to anonymously track and receive updates regarding the status of their sexual assault evidence kits; and (4) use technology to allow continuous access for appropriate personnel. Effective July 1, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SEXUAL ASSAULT EVIDNC TRACKING

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2019-08-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
2019-07-30HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen
2019-07-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa
2019-07-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita
2019-06-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
2019-03-29HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-21HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
2019-03-21HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2019-01-29HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2019-01-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-01-09HouseFirst Reading
2018-11-30HousePrefiled with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
72520221New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback