IL HB0015 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Creates the offense of violation of civil rights. Provides that a person commits violation of civil rights when he or she knowingly: (1) denies to another the full and equal enjoyment of the facilities and services of a place of public accommodation because of unlawful discrimination; (2) as the operator of a place of public accommodation, directly or indirectly, publishes, circulates, displays, mails, or emails a written or electronic communication, except a private communication sent in response to a specific inquiry, which he or she knows is to the effect that a facility of the place of public accommodation will be denied to a person because of unlawful discrimination or that the patronage of a person is unwelcome, objectionable, or unacceptable for the purpose of unlawful discrimination; (3) as a public official, refuses to employ, or discriminates in the employment of another for a public contract or public works project because of unlawful discrimination; or (4) as a public official, denies or refuses to a person the full and equal enjoyment of the accommodations, advantages, facilities, or privileges of his or her office or services or of property under his or her care because of unlawful discrimination. Prohibits various private employment practices. Defines "unlawful discrimination". Provides that nothing in this provision shall be construed to impose criminal liability for actions that are exempt from civil liability under the Illinois Human Rights Act. Provides that a violation is a Class B misdemeanor. Effective immediately.
Title
CRIM CD-CIVIL RIGHTS VIOLATION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-02-19 | House | To Sentencing, Penalities and Criminal Procedure Subcommittee |
2019-01-29 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | First Reading |
2018-11-30 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=15&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB0015.htm |