IL HB0021 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Police Act. Provides that it is not a requirement of a person filing a complaint against a State Police Officer to have a complaint supported by a sworn affidavit or any other legal documentation (rather than anyone filing a complaint filing a complaint against a State Police Officer must have the complaint supported by a sworn affidavit). Amends the Uniform Peace Officers' Disciplinary Act. Provides that it is not a requirement of a person filing a complaint against a sworn peace officer to have the complaint supported by a sworn affidavit or any other legal documentation (rather than anyone filing a complaint against a sworn peace officer must have the complaint supported by a sworn affidavit). Provides that the provision is a limitation of power on home rule units under the Illinois Constitution.
Title
COMPLAINTS AGAINST POLICE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-19 | House | To Criminal Administration and Enforcement Subcommittee |
2019-01-29 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | First Reading |
2018-11-30 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2610 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
50 | 725 | 3.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=21&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB0021.htm |