IL HB0022 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Chicago School District Article of the School Code. Requires the Chicago Board of Education to establish a school nurse pilot program. Provides that under the program, the Board shall require the top 20% of the lowest performing schools in the school district, as determined by the Board, to employ a school nurse in conformance with certain provisions of the Code concerning school nurses. Requires the Board to implement this program beginning with the 2019-2020 school year. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CD-CHI-SCH NURSE REQUIRED
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-12 | House | Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2019-03-12 | House | Moved to Suspend Rule 21 Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-01-29 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | First Reading |
2018-11-30 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=22&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB0022.htm |