IL HB0027 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Vocational Academy Opportunity Act. Creates 2 vocational academies, one located in Cook County and the other in a downstate county, which shall be residential institutions. Provides that each academy shall be a State agency, funded by State appropriations, private contributions, and endowments. Provides that the academies shall be governed by a single Board of Trustees for the collective operation and oversight of the academies. Provides for the membership of the Board. Specifies the duties and powers of the Board. Provides that each academy shall be empowered to lease or purchase real and personal property on commercially reasonable terms for the use by the academy.
Title
VOCATIONAL OPPORTUNITY ACT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-06-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-05-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2020-03-12 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2020-03-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2020-03-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2019-04-12 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended |
2019-03-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2019-03-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended |
2019-03-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2019-03-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. André Thapedi |
2019-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2019-02-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-02-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2019-02-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2019-02-08 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2019-02-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2019-02-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2019-02-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2019-02-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2019-02-06 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 012-000-000 |
2019-01-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2019-01-29 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-01-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | First Reading |
2018-11-30 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. André Thapedi |