IL HB0034 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-19 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-19 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. In a Section concerning the homestead exemption for veterans with disabilities, provides that: (1) for taxable years prior to 2015, "surviving spouse" means the surviving spouse of a veteran who obtained the exemption prior to his or her death; (2) for taxable years 2015 through 2018, "surviving spouse" means (A) the surviving spouse of a veteran who obtained the exemption prior to his or her death and (B) the surviving spouse of a veteran who was killed in the line of duty in the current taxable year or any preceding taxable year; and (3) for taxable year 2019 and thereafter, "surviving spouse" means (A) the surviving spouse of a veteran who qualified for the exemption prior to his or her death, (B) the surviving spouse of a veteran who was killed in the line of duty in the current taxable year or any preceding taxable year, (C) the surviving spouse of a veteran who did not obtain the exemption before death, but who would have qualified for the exemption if he or she had survived, and (D) the surviving spouse of a veteran whose death was determined to be service-connected who is a current recipient of Dependency and Indemnity Compensation. Effective immediately.
Title
PROP TX-SURVIVING SPOUSE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2020-05-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2020-01-10 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2020-01-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2019-11-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2019-10-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa |
2019-04-01 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2019-04-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2019-02-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Murphy |
2019-02-07 | House | To Property Tax Subcommittee |
2019-02-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2019-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker |
2019-02-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2019-02-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
2019-01-29 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | First Reading |
2018-11-30 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 15-169 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=34&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB0034.htm |