IL HB0035 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-0)
Status: Passed on July 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0122
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-0)
Status: Passed on July 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0122
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Grow Your Own Teacher Education Act. Makes changes to the definitions of "cohort", "eligible school", and "hard-to-staff school", and defines "dual credit course". Provides that Grown Your Own Illinois (rather than the Board of Higher Education) shall administer the Grow Your Own Teacher Education Initiative as a grant competition to fund consortia that will carry out Grow Your Own Teacher preparation programs. In provisions concerning selection of grantees, provides that the Board of Higher Education shall, subject to appropriation, allocate funds to Grow Your Own Illinois for the purpose of administering the program and awarding grants under the Act (rather than requiring the Board of Higher Education to award grants under the Act). Removes the language providing that the consortium shall consider whether a candidate has experienced an interruption in his or her college education when recruiting potential candidates for the program. Provides that, subject to the requirements under the Dual Credit Quality Act, an institution of higher education may offer a high school student a dual credit course under the program. Provides that the Board of Higher Education may not adopt rules regarding candidate eligibility that are more restrictive than those in the Act. Makes conforming changes. Effective immediately.
Title
GROW YOUR OWN TEACHER
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 46 N: 5 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 70 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 70 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-26 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0122 |
2019-07-26 | House | Effective Date July 26, 2019 |
2019-07-26 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-19 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-21 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 046-005-000 |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2019 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2019 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Do Pass Higher Education; 010-000-000 |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Postponed - Higher Education |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Higher Education |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-03-19 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-03-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-03-19 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2019-03-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2019-03-19 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 070-042-000 |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2019-02-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-02-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2019-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2019-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2019-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2019-02-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2019-02-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2019-02-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-02-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2019-02-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2019-02-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-02-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2019-02-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2019-02-13 | House | Fiscal Note Filed |
2019-02-13 | House | Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2019-02-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2019-02-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2019-02-13 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2019-02-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2019-02-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2019-02-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
2019-02-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2019-02-07 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
2019-02-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-02-06 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 016-000-000 |
2019-02-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
2019-01-29 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | First Reading |
2018-11-30 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 48 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 48 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 48 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 48 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 48 | 30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |