IL HB0037 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0222
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0222
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Board of Education - Powers and Duties Article of the School Code. Makes the State Seal of Biliteracy available to both public and non-public high school graduates (rather than public high school graduates only) who have attained a high level of proficiency in one or more language in addition to English and have met the criteria to obtain the State Seal of Biliteracy. Makes conforming changes.
Title
SCH CD - BILITERACY SEAL
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-09 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0222 |
2019-08-09 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-08-09 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-21 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-23 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2019 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 011-000-000 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Terry Link |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-03-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2019-03-19 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 |
2019-02-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-02-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-02-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-02-06 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 020-000-000 |
2019-01-29 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | First Reading |
2018-11-30 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 2-3.159 | Amended Code | Citation Text |