IL HB0043 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that certain property located in Bloom, Bremen, Calumet, Rich, Thornton, or Worth Township may be certified by the South Suburban Land Bank and Development Authority as a southland reactivation site. Provides that southland reactivation property shall be valued at 33 1/3% of the fair cash value of the land, without regard to buildings, structures, improvements, and other permanent fixtures located on the property. Provides that, for the first 3 tax years after the property is certified as southland reactivation property, the aggregate tax liability for the property shall be no greater than $75,000. Provides that, beginning with the fourth tax year after the property is certified as southland reactivation property and continuing through the twelfth tax year after the property is certified as southland reactivation property, the property's tax liability for each taxing district in which the property is located shall be increased over the tax liability for the preceding year by the percentage increase, if any, in the total equalized assessed value of all property in the taxing district.
Title
PROP TX-SOUTHLAND PROPERTY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-01-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2020-01-28 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2020-01-28 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-001-000 |
2019-04-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-12 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2019-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-21 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 014-000-000 |
2019-03-21 | House | Reported Back To Revenue & Finance Committee; |
2019-03-21 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue & Finance Committee; 006-000-000 |
2019-02-07 | House | To Property Tax Subcommittee |
2019-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2019-01-29 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-01-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2019-01-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2019-01-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2019-01-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2019-01-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2019-01-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2019-01-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2019-01-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2019-01-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2019-01-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | First Reading |
2018-11-30 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 10-21 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 10-800 | New Code | See Bill Text |