IL HB0049 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Identification Act. Provides that records of charges that result in an acquittal or dismissal with prejudice, except for minor traffic offenses, may be immediately expunged after the final disposition of the case. Provides that upon entry of judgment, the defendant shall be informed of this right and the proper procedures to follow to have records that are eligible be immediately expunged. Provides that the petition may be filed on behalf of the defendant by his or her attorney at the final disposition hearing, or by the defendant at any time. Provides that the State's Attorney may not object to an immediate expungement petition and the presiding trial judge shall enter an order granting or denying the petition during the hearing in which the petition is filed. Provides that no fees shall be charged by the circuit court clerk or the Department of State Police for processing petitions filed under this provision. Makes other changes.
Title
CRIM ID-IMMEDIATE EXPUNGE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2020-01-28 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-19 | House | To Sentencing, Penalities and Criminal Procedure Subcommittee |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-01-29 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | First Reading |
2018-12-03 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2630 | 5.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=49&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB0049.htm |