IL HB0105 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0082
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0082
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Fire Investigation Act. Replaces "the Office of the State Fire Marshal" with "the Office". Provides Section headings. Makes formatting changes. Refers to specified rules adopted by the Office as "fire prevention and life safety rules". Provides that the Office shall identify dangerous conditions or fire hazards and notify the owner, occupant, or other person interested in the premises. Provides that if no corrective action is taken by the owner, occupant, or other person interested in a premises to remove or remedy dangerous conditions or fire hazards within a reasonable time, as determined by the Office or the local authority having jurisdiction, an order shall be served upon the owner, occupant, or other person interested in the premises directing that the dangerous condition be removed or remedied immediately. Provides service and procedural requirements regarding the owner, occupant, or person interested in the premises. Provides that the Act's provisions regarding enforcement, service, and procedural requirements are not applicable within the geographical boundaries of home rule units that have adopted fire prevention and life safety standards by local ordinance, except with respect to State-owned buildings or State licensed facilities. Provides that the Act's provisions are severable. Makes other changes.
Title
LOCAL GOVERNMENT-TECH
Sponsors
Rep. Kathleen Willis [D] | Rep. Michelle Mussman [D] | Sen. Sara Feigenholtz [D] | Rep. Natalie Manley [D] |
Sen. Thomas Cullerton [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-15 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0082 |
2019-07-15 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-07-15 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-05-23 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-001 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2019 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2019 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Do Pass Local Government; 007-000-000 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-04 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 |
2019-04-02 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-04-02 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Cities & Villages Committee; 010-000-000 |
2019-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2019-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2019-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2019-03-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Cities & Villages Committee |
2019-03-13 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2019-03-12 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2019-02-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate ** |
2019-02-06 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-005-000 |
2019-01-29 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | First Reading |
2018-12-10 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
50 | 50 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |