IL HB0137 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0226
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0226
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the engrossed bill with the following changes. In a provision that excludes routine maintenance of community water supplies from rules governing certain corrosion prevention projects, provides that routine maintenance activities shall (instead of may) include specified activities.
Title
STATE GOVERNMENT-TECH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-01 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 71 N: 43 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 42 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 70 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 42 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 70 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-09 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0226 |
2019-08-09 | House | Effective Date June 1, 2020 |
2019-08-09 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-28 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-06-01 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-06-01 | House | House Concurs |
2019-06-01 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 071-043-000 |
2019-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Energy & Environment Committee; 016-007-000 |
2019-05-29 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Energy & Environment Committee |
2019-05-28 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-28 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2019-05-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2019-05-28 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 042-015-000 |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 27, 2019 |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Castro |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 24, 2019 |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 012-003-000 |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 24, 2019 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Re-assigned to Executive |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Postponed - Transportation |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 17, 2019 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Postponed - Transportation |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Postponed - Transportation |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Cristina Castro |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-11 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 070-039-000 |
2019-04-11 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-04-10 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2019-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Energy & Environment Committee; 019-007-000 |
2019-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Energy & Environment Committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2019-04-04 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2019-02-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate ** |
2019-02-06 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-005-000 |
2019-01-29 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | First Reading |
2018-12-10 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 205 | 0.01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |