IL HB0142 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0030
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0030
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Rebuild Illinois Capital Financing Program of 2019. Amends the General Obligation Bond Act. Increases the amount of bonded indebtedness authorized to $78,256,839,969 from $57,717,925,743, and specifies the uses for which the additional moneys may be used. Expands the Funds used to determine the debt limit to include the Fund for the Advancement of Education, the Commitment to Human Services Fund, and the Budget Stabilization Fund (currently, the General Revenue Fund, the Common School Fund, the General Revenue Common School Special Account Fund, and the Education Assistance Fund). Creates the Mass Transportation Bond Fund. Amends the Build Illinois Bond Act. Increases the amount of bonded indebtedness authorized to $9,484,681,100 from $6,246,009,000, and specifies the uses for which the additional moneys may be used. Amends the State Finance Act and the Regional Transportation Authority Act. Makes conforming changes. Effective immediately.
Title
FINANCE-TECH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-01 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 94 N: 20 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-31 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-31 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-28 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0030 |
2019-06-28 | House | Effective Date June 28, 2019 |
2019-06-28 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-06 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-06-01 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-06-01 | House | House Concurs |
2019-06-01 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2019-06-01 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 094-020-000 |
2019-06-01 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000 |
2019-06-01 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-06-01 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-06-01 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-06-01 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2019-06-01 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-06-01 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-006-000 |
2019-06-01 | Senate | 3/5 Vote Required |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Manar |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar; -Sandoval |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Andy Manar |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 29, 2019 |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 16, 2019 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Do Pass State Government; 005-000-000 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Waive Posting Notice |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Re-assigned to State Government |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 17, 2019 |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Postponed - State Government |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Postponed - State Government |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled |
2019-04-10 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 |
2019-04-09 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2019-04-09 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 010-000-000 |
2019-04-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2019-03-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2019-03-18 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2019-02-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate ** |
2019-02-06 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-005-000 |
2019-01-29 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | First Reading |
2018-12-10 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 305 | 0.01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |