IL HB0149 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-7)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-7)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends "An Act concerning appropriations", Public Act 97-730. Designates the Department of Human Services as the State agency to receive funds appropriated from the Health and Human Services Medicaid Trust Fund for awards and grants to developmental disabilities or mental health programs (rather than for awards and grants to developmental disabilities programs). Appropriates $12,000,000, or so much thereof as may be necessary, from the General Revenue Fund to the Department of Human Services' Division of Mental Health for the sole purpose of restoring funds to capacity grant funded programs that were reduced and preventing payment delays in fee-for-service programs. Effective immediately.
Title
$DHS- MENTAL HEALTH PROGRAMS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2013-08-09 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2013-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandra M. Pihos |
2013-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis |
2013-02-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Scott Drury |
2013-02-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2013-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2013-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Esther Golar |
2013-02-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2013-02-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2013-02-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Darlene J. Senger |
2013-01-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2013-01-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2013-01-30 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2013-01-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2013-01-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2013-01-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2013-01-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2013-01-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John D'Amico |
2013-01-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2013-01-29 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. JoAnn D. Osmond |
2013-01-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. JoAnn D. Osmond |
2013-01-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2013-01-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2013-01-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2013-01-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine Hammond |
2013-01-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2013-01-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2013-01-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios |
2013-01-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson |
2013-01-25 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2013-01-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2013-01-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence M. Walsh, Jr. |
2013-01-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2013-01-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David R. Leitch |
2013-01-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2013-01-22 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. JoAnn D. Osmond |
2013-01-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2013-01-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. JoAnn D. Osmond |
2013-01-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Greg Harris |
2013-01-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-01-14 | House | First Reading |
2013-01-11 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=149&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HB/PDF/09800HB0149.pdf |