IL HB0157 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-11 - Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Robert F. Martwick
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-11 - Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Robert F. Martwick
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Implementation of Legislation Reporting Act. Provides that any State agency required to provide benefits or services under the provisions of a covered Public Act shall prepare an Implementation Report relating to that covered Public Act, and file the Report with the General Assembly. Requires the Implementation Report to also be published on the General Assembly's Internet website. Defines terms. Effective immediately.
Title
IMPLEMENT LEGISLATION REPORT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 101 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-11 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Robert F. Martwick |
2021-01-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading January 11, 2021 |
2021-01-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As January 13, 2021 |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading January 10, 2021 |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 4, 2019 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2019-03-29 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2019-03-29 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2019-03-29 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2019-03-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2019-03-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2019-03-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2019-03-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2019-03-28 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 101-010-000 |
2019-03-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-20 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 010-000-000 |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2019-01-29 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | First Reading |
2018-12-11 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |