IL HB0158 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Provides that, from February 1, 2020 through January 31, 2021, the amount transferred from the General Revenue Fund to the Local Government Distributive Fund shall be: (i) 8.5% of the net revenue realized from the tax imposed on individuals, trusts, and estates, and (ii) 9.355% of the net revenue realized from the tax imposed on corporations. Provides that, from February 1, 2021 through January 31, 2022, the amount transferred from the General Revenue Fund to the Local Government Distributive Fund shall be: (i) 9% of the net revenue realized from the tax imposed on individuals, trusts, and estates, and (ii) 9.57% of the net revenue realized from the tax imposed on corporations. Provides that, from February 1, 2022 through January 31, 2023, the amount transferred from the General Revenue Fund to the Local Government Distributive Fund shall be: (i) 9.5% of the net revenue realized from the tax imposed on individuals, trusts, and estates, and (ii) 9.785% of the net revenue realized from the tax imposed on corporations. Provides that, beginning on February 1, 2023, the Treasurer shall transfer each month from the General Revenue Fund to the Local Government Distributive Fund an amount equal to 10% of the net revenue realized from the tax imposed on individuals, trusts, estates, and corporations during the preceding month. Effective immediately.
Title
INC TX-LGDF
Sponsors
Rep. Anthony DeLuca [D] | Rep. Emanuel Welch [D] | Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin [D] | Rep. Margo McDermed [R] |
Rep. Terra Costa Howard [D] | Rep. Stephanie Kifowit [D] | Rep. Barbara Hernandez [D] | Sen. Diane Pappas [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas |
2020-01-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2020-01-28 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-001-000 |
2019-04-12 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2019-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2019-03-06 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-02-27 | House | Fiscal Note Filed |
2019-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2019-02-26 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-02-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-02-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2019-02-19 | House | Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2019-02-14 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-02-13 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Cities & Villages Committee; 010-000-000 |
2019-02-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2019-02-05 | House | Assigned to Cities & Villages Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | First Reading |
2018-12-11 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 5 | 901 | Amended Code | Citation Text |