IL HB0159 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Business Enterprise for Minorities, Females, and Persons with Disabilities Act. Provides that all State agencies shall increase their award of State contracts to minority owned businesses by 15%.
Title
ST CONTRACTS-MINORITY BUSINESS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | To Agency Operation Subcommittee |
2020-03-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee |
2020-02-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2020-02-18 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-05 | House | To Government Process Subcommittee |
2019-01-29 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | First Reading |
2018-12-12 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 575 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |