IL HB0162 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-29 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-29 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Controlled Substances Act. Provides that a sentencing enhancement of an additional 3 years imprisonment is applicable when the controlled substance also contains any amount of a fentanyl analog for the following violations: manufacture or delivery, or possession with intent to manufacture or deliver, a controlled substance, a counterfeit substance, or controlled substance analog; controlled substance trafficking; calculated criminal drug conspiracy; criminal drug conspiracy; streetgang criminal drug conspiracy; or delivery of a controlled, counterfeit, or look-alike substance to a person under 18 years of age (currently, the sentencing enhancement is applicable only to additional amounts of fentanyl). Effective immediately.
Title
CONTROLLED SUB-FENTANYL ANALOG
Sponsors
Rep. Katie Stuart [D] | Rep. Monica Bristow [D] | Rep. Lance Yednock [D] | Sen. Karina Villa [D] |
Sen. Mary Edly-Allen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
2019-07-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-19 | House | To Sentencing, Penalities and Criminal Procedure Subcommittee |
2019-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock |
2019-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2019-01-29 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | First Reading |
2018-12-12 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 570 | 401 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=162&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB0162.htm |