IL HB0163 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-10 - Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-10 - Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Controlled Substances Act. Provides that the information required to be transmitted under the prescription monitoring program must be transmitted not later than the end of the business day on which a controlled substance is dispensed, or at such other time as may be required by the Department of Human Services by administrative rule (rather than, at the end of the next business day on which the controlled substance is dispensed).
Title
PRESCRIPTION MONITORING REPORT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2021-01-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2021-01-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2021-01-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2021-01-08 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As January 13, 2021 |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading January 10, 2021 |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Postponed - Public Health |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Public Health |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 17, 2019 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Postponed - Public Health |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Public Health |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Postponed - Public Health |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2019-03-19 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 |
2019-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2019-03-06 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-06 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-03-06 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2019-02-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2019-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2019-02-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart |
2019-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
2019-02-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2019-02-14 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2019-02-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2019-02-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2019-02-13 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2019-02-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2019-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock |
2019-02-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-02-06 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 013-000-000 |
2019-01-29 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | First Reading |
2018-12-12 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 570 | 316 | Amended Code | Citation Text |