IL HB0175 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Personnel Code. Provides that State agencies, when hiring for full-time, temporary positions with an expected tenure of 12 to 24 months for the position, shall give preference to a qualified applicant who is from a low-income household or has been unemployed for 6 months or more. Provides that State agencies, when hiring for internships, student assistant positions, and summer positions, shall give preference to a qualified applicant who resides in a low-income household, is up to 21 years old, and is currently attending high school.
Title
PERSONNEL-LOW-INCOME HOUSEHOLD
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | To Personnel Code Subcommittee |
2019-01-29 | House | Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | First Reading |
2018-12-17 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=175&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB0175.htm |