IL HB0178 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Community-Integrated Living Arrangements Licensure and Certification Act. Provides that licenses for community mental health or developmental services agencies are valid for one year (rather than 3 years). Provides that an agency licensed under the Act or a community-integrated living arrangement certified by an agency must maintain for public inspection copies of investigative reports and surveys conducted by the Department of Human Services. Provides that the Department must prepare a quarterly report detailing violations of the Act by an agency licensed under the Act or a community-integrated living arrangement certified by an agency and must publish the report on its website. Provides that the report must include the name and address of each agency and community-integrated living arrangement that violates the Act.
Title
COMMUNITY-INTEGRATED LIVING
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Flowers [D] | Rep. Frances Hurley [D] | Rep. Latoya Greenwood [D] | Rep. Charles Meier [R] |
Rep. Joyce Mason [D] | Rep. Anne Stava-Murray [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-15 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-15 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-15 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2019-04-12 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2019-02-28 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2019-02-27 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 014-000-000 |
2019-01-29 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | First Reading |
2018-12-17 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
210 | 135 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |