IL HB0205 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-07-03 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Critical Health Problems and Comprehensive Health Education Act to require the instruction on mental health and illness to evaluate the multiple dimensions of health by reviewing the relationship between physical and mental health so as to enhance student understanding, attitudes, and behaviors that promote health, well-being, and human dignity.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH MENTAL HEALTH INSTRUCTION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-03SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2019-05-27SenateSponsor Removed Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton
2019-05-24SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2019-05-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Higher Education
2019-05-15SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Higher Education
2019-05-14SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-05-14SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2019-05-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2019
2019-05-14SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2019-05-14SenateRe-referred to Assignments
2019-05-13SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2019-05-10SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 17, 2019
2019-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton
2019-05-03SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
2019-05-02SenatePostponed - Education
2019-04-24SenateAssigned to Education
2019-03-20SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-03-20SenateFirst Reading
2019-03-20SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman
2019-03-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2019-03-20SenateArrive in Senate
2019-03-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2019-03-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
2019-03-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2019-03-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2019-03-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo
2019-03-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2019-03-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2019-03-19HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-002-001
2019-02-26HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-02-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
2019-02-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
2019-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2019-02-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2019-02-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2019-02-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2019-02-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2019-02-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
2019-02-07HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-02-07HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Mental Health Committee; 019-000-000
2019-02-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2019-02-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen
2019-02-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith
2019-02-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker
2019-02-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas
2019-02-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2019-02-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
2019-01-29HouseAssigned to Mental Health Committee
2019-01-29HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2019-01-29HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Karina Villa
2019-01-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-01-09HouseFirst Reading
2018-12-20HousePrefiled with Clerk by Rep. Deb Conroy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1051103Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback