IL HB0213 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on September 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-08 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0466
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on September 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-08 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0466
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the School Choice Act. Contains findings and declarations of policy. Establishes the School Choice Program. Provides that under the program the custodian of a qualifying pupil is entitled to a School Choice Scholarship to pay for qualified education expenses at participating nonpublic schools. Requires the principal of each public school to notify custodians of qualifying pupils of the availability of scholarships. Requires custodians to apply to the State Board of Education for a scholarship and provide documentation as to eligibility. Requires the State Board to issue a scholarship to custodians who have made proper application and to honor the scholarship when presented for payment by a nonpublic school. Provides for the amount of a scholarship. Provides that the scholarship may be renewed each year through the 12th grade so long as the pupil and custodian remain eligible. Contains funding provisions. Provides that the amount received under the program shall not be considered base income for purposes of Illinois' income tax. Requires the State Board to submit a report to the General Assembly on or before December 31, 2020. Sets forth criminal penalties for certain violations. Requires the State Board to adopt rules to implement the Act. Repeals the Act on January 1, 2021. Amends the Illinois Lottery Law and the Illinois Income Tax Act to make conforming changes. Effective immediately.
Title
SCHOOL CHOICE ACT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-23 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 82 N: 22 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 82 N: 22 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-08 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0466 |
2017-09-08 | House | Effective Date June 1, 2018 |
2017-09-08 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-07-21 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-06-23 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-06-23 | House | House Concurs |
2017-06-23 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 097-002-000 |
2017-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 016-000-000 |
2017-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2017-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2017-05-29 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2017-05-29 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Lightford |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 011-000-000 |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2017 |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 4, 2017 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 009-002-000 |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-03-14 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2017-03-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2017-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2017-03-14 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2017-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2017-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2017-03-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2017-03-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2017-03-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2017-03-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2017-03-14 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 082-022-000 |
2017-03-09 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-09 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-08 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 018-000-000 |
2017-03-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; by Voice Vote |
2017-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2017-02-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2017-01-25 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2017-01-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-11 | House | First Reading |
2016-12-05 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 1605 | 7.4a | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 5 | 203 | Amended Code | Citation Text |