IL HB0213 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Power Agency Act, the Public Utilities Act, and the Energy Assistance Act. Provides that the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity, the Illinois Commerce Commission, and the Illinois Power Agency shall cooperate in issuing a report evaluating opportunities for electric utility customers' ability to participate in the State's clean energy economy. Provides for repeal of the provisions on January 1, 2021. Effective immediately.
Title
ENERGY ECONOMY ACCESS STUDY
Sponsors
Rep. Jay Hoffman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-21 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2019-02-06 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2019-01-29 | House | Assigned to Public Utilities Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | First Reading |
2018-12-21 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 3855 | 1-76 | New Code | See Bill Text |
220 | 5 | 16-111.10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
305 | 20 | 19 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=213&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB0213.htm |