IL HB0214 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Power Agency Act. Provides that the Illinois Power Agency shall issue a report evaluating the implementation of the electric supply procurement requirements and processes set forth in the Act through the period ending May 31, 2019. Provides for repeal of the provisions on January 1, 2021. Effective immediately.
Title
POWER AGENCY REPORT-PROCUREMT
Sponsors
Rep. Jay Hoffman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-21 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2019-02-06 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2019-01-29 | House | Assigned to Public Utilities Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | First Reading |
2018-12-21 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=214&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB0214.htm |