IL HB0241 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Election Code. Requires (rather than encourages) a school district to close a school or hold a teachers institute day if the school is chosen as a polling place by the county board or board of election commissioners. Effective immediately.
Title
ELEC CD-SCHOOLS-POLLING PLACE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-12 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2019-03-07 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-03-07 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-02-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2019-02-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-02-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-01-29 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | First Reading |
2019-01-07 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Margo McDermed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 5 | 11-4.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=241&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB0241.htm |