IL HB0250 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 29 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-06-27 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Property Tax Code and the Mobile Home Local Services Tax Enforcement Act. Provides that tax sales need not be held within the county.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PROP TX-NOTICE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-29 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-27HouseSent to the Governor
2019-05-29HousePassed Both Houses
2019-05-29HouseHouse Concurs
2019-05-29HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 117-000-000
2019-05-24HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Revenue & Finance Committee; 010-000-001
2019-05-23HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Revenue & Finance Committee
2019-05-22HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-22HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2019-05-21HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 2
2019-05-21HouseArrived in House
2019-05-21SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2019-05-21SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
2019-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2019
2019-05-16SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 14, 2019
2019-05-09SenateDo Pass as Amended Revenue; 008-000-000
2019-05-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2019-05-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments.
2019-05-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Revenue
2019-05-02SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2019-05-02SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jason A. Barickman
2019-05-02SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-05-02SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jason A. Barickman
2019-05-01SenatePostponed - Revenue
2019-04-24SenateAssigned to Revenue
2019-04-11SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-04-11SenateFirst Reading
2019-04-11SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman
2019-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2019-04-11SenateArrive in Senate
2019-04-11HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2019-04-11HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
2019-04-11HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-11HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2019-04-10HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-10HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-10HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Revenue & Finance Committee; 010-000-000
2019-04-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
2019-04-02HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-04-02HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2019-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2019-03-28HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 015-000-000
2019-03-28HouseReported Back To Revenue & Finance Committee;
2019-03-28HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue & Finance Committee; 006-000-000
2019-03-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2019-02-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski
2019-02-07HouseTo Property Tax Subcommittee
2019-01-29HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2019-01-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-01-09HouseFirst Reading
2019-01-08HousePrefiled with Clerk by Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3520021-115Amended CodeCitation Text
3551660Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=250&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB0250.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB0250eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB0250enr.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB0250ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB0250ham002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB0250sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB0250sam002.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/house/10100HB0250_04112019_034000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100HB0250_05212019_018000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/house/10100HB0250sam002_05292019_010000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback