IL HB0253 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0380
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0380
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Educational Labor Relations Act. Provides that the term "student" within the definition of "educational employee" or "employee" as used in the Act excludes (rather than includes) graduate students who are research assistants primarily performing duties that involve research, graduate assistants primarily performing duties that are pre-professional, graduate students who are teaching assistants primarily performing duties that involve the delivery and support of instruction, or any other graduate assistants. Effective immediately.
Title
EDU LABOR ACT-EMPLOYEE DEFN
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 35 N: 19 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 72 N: 37 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 72 N: 37 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-16 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0380 |
2019-08-16 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-08-16 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-19 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-21 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 035-019-000 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2019 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2019 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Do Pass Labor; 011-005-000 |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Labor |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-03 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-03-28 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 072-037-000 |
2019-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva |
2019-03-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2019-03-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2019-03-07 | House | Balanced Budget Note Filed |
2019-03-06 | House | Home Rule Note Filed |
2019-03-06 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed |
2019-03-06 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-06 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-05 | House | Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed |
2019-03-05 | House | Balanced Budget Note Requested by Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2019-03-05 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2019-03-05 | House | Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed |
2019-03-04 | House | Fiscal Note Filed |
2019-03-04 | House | State Debt Impact Note Filed |
2019-03-04 | House | Pension Note Filed |
2019-03-04 | House | Judicial Note Filed |
2019-03-01 | House | Correctional Note Filed |
2019-02-28 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-02-27 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 017-010-000 |
2019-01-29 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | First Reading |
2019-01-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Will Guzzardi |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
115 | 5 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |